NH SB212 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-12 - Sen. Carson Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-12 - Sen. Carson Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the membership and duties of the juvenile justice advisory board and the Sununu Youth Services Center.
Title
Relative to the membership and duties of the juvenile justice advisory board and the Sununu Youth Services Center.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-12 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 8 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Pending Motion OT3rdg; Senate Journal 8 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 8 |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/12/15; Senate Calendar 12 |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Hearing: 2/17/15, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 1:20 p.m.; Senate Calendar 10 |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 5 |