NH SB212 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 03/09/2023; Senate Journal 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 03/09/2023; Senate Journal 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the regulation of massage, reflexology, structural integrator, and Asian bodywork therapy establishments.
Title
Relative to the regulation of massage, reflexology, structural integrator, and Asian bodywork therapy establishments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-09 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 03/09/2023; Senate Journal 9 |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/09/2023; Senate Calendar 12 |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Hearing: 02/15/2023, Room 103, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 10 |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 5 |