NH SB216 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-28 - Signed by the Governor on 05/27/2014; Chapter 0070; Effective 07/26/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-28 - Signed by the Governor on 05/27/2014; Chapter 0070; Effective 07/26/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to designating an alternate trustee of the trust fund.
Title
Relative to designating an alternate trustee of the trust fund.
Sponsors
Sen. John Reagan [R] | Rep. Dan McGuire [R] | Rep. Kyle Tasker [R] | Rep. Carol McGuire [R] |
Rep. Joe Duarte [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-28 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 05/27/2014; Chapter 0070; Effective 07/26/2014 |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Enrolled 05/01/2014 |
2014-05-05 | House | Enrolled (In recess of 4/30/14) |
2014-04-23 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-04-17 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 31 |
2014-04-02 | House | Executive Session: 4/15/14 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2014-03-18 | House | Public Hearing: 4/1/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2014-03-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to Municipal and County Government |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0186s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0186s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0186s, 1/30/14; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 4 |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Hearing: 1/22/14, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 2 |
2013-12-11 | Senate | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs |