NH SB231 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-29 - Signed by the Governor on 07/28/2014; Chapter 0282; Effective 07/28/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-29 - Signed by the Governor on 07/28/2014; Chapter 0282; Effective 07/28/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to regulation of tractors and utility vehicles.
Title
Relative to regulation of tractors and utility vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/28/2014; Chapter 0282; Effective 07/28/2014 |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-06-04 | House | Enrolled |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Sen. Rausch Concurs with House Amendments #1602h, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 14 |
2014-05-07 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #1602h Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-05-07 | House | Amendment #2014-1602h Amendment Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-05-01 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-1602h (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 34 |
2014-04-23 | House | Continued Executive Session: 4/30/2014 12:00 PM or at session linch brreak Legislative Office Building 203 |
2014-04-15 | House | =REVISED=Executive Session: 4/22/14 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203=RECESSED= |
2014-03-25 | House | Public Hearing: 4/15/2014 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2014-03-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to Transportation |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0530s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Sen. Gilmour Floor Amendment #2014-0530s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0529s, New Title, Amendment Failed, Voice Vote |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0529s, New Title, 2/19/14; Senate Calendar 7 |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Hearing: 1/28/14, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 1:30 p.m.; Senate Calendar 4 |
2013-12-20 | Senate | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Transportation |