NH SB236 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB236
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-2440h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 59
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-2440h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 59
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study nonprofit organizations contracting with the department of health and human services for children's services.
Title
Establishing a committee to study nonprofit organizations contracting with the department of health and human services for children's services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-2440h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 59 |
2024-01-03 | House | Amendment # 2023-2440h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 59 |
2023-11-16 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-2440h 11/13/2023 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 49 P. 16 |
2023-11-08 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 11/13/2023 10:45 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 House Calendar 44 |
2023-10-30 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 11/06/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 House Calendar 44 |
2023-10-18 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/24/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 House Calendar 42 |
2023-04-20 | House | Retained in Committee |
2023-04-12 | House | Executive Session: 04/19/2023 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2023-03-29 | House | Public Hearing: 04/12/2023 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-03-20 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2023-0653s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/09/2023; Senate Journal 9 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0653s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/09/2023; Senate Journal 9 |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0653s, 03/09/2023; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 12 |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Hearing: 02/22/2023, Room 100, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 11 |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 5 |
Same As/Similar To
SB236 (Carry Over) 2023-04-20 - Retained in Committee