NH SB25 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB25
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 48
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 48
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing a requirement for a report on chartered public school payments.
Title
Repealing a requirement for a report on chartered public school payments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 48 |
2023-11-17 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate SB25 11/13/2023 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 49 P. 9 |
2023-10-10 | House | Executive Session: 11/13/2023 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 House Calendar 41 |
2023-10-10 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 10/18/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 House Calendar 41 |
2023-09-20 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 10/05/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 House Calendar 38 |
2023-05-10 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 05/30/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-04-12 | House | Retained in Committee |
2023-04-05 | House | Executive Session: 04/11/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-03-23 | House | Public Hearing: 03/29/2023 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-03-20 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Education |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 01/19/2023; Senate Journal 4 |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 01/19/2023; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 6 |
2023-01-06 | Senate | Hearing: 01/10/2023, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 5 |
2023-01-05 | Senate | Introduced 01/05/2023 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 4 |
Same As/Similar To
SB25 (Carry Over) 2023-09-20 - Full Committee Work Session: 10/05/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 House Calendar 38