NH SB258 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-17 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Division Vote 224-50; House Journal 46, PG.2452
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-17 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Division Vote 224-50; House Journal 46, PG.2452
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing group net metering for limited electrical energy producers.
Title
Authorizing group net metering for limited electrical energy producers.
Sponsors
Sen. Lou D'Allesandro [D] | Rep. Samuel Hawkes [D] | Sen. Matthew Houde [D] | Sen. Molly Kelly [D] |
Sen. Sylvia Larsen [D] | Rep. Amanda Merrill [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-28 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-17 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Division Vote 224-50; House Journal 46, PG.2452 | |
2012-05-09 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for May 15 (Vote 13-4; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 37, PG.2047 | |
2012-04-18 | House Executive Session: 5/8/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 | |
2012-04-18 | House Full Committee Work Session: 5/3/2012 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 ==Executive Session May Follow== | |
2012-04-04 | House Public Hearing: 4/17/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 | |
2012-03-29 | House Introduced and Referred to Science, Technology and Energy; House Journal 32, PG. 1913 | |
2012-03-28 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 1401s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted: OT3rdg; Senate Journal 8, Pg.327 | |
2012-03-28 | Senate Committee Amendment 1401s; Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 8, Pg.279 | |
2012-03-22 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2012-1401s, 3/28/12; Senate Calendar 12 | |
2012-02-22 | Senate Hearing: 3/8/12, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 9 | |
2012-01-01 | Senate Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 1, Pg.6 |