NH SB258 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-27 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-27 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permitting the public utilities commission to authorize a telephone company to permanently discontinue its service.
Title
Permitting the public utilities commission to authorize a telephone company to permanently discontinue its service.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 8 |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 3/27/14; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 11 |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Hearing: 1/29/14, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 3 |
2013-12-11 | Senate | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources |