NH SB258 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-11 - Signed by the Governor on 06/05/2015; Chapter 0109; Effective 06/05/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-11 - Signed by the Governor on 06/05/2015; Chapter 0109; Effective 06/05/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Changing the timing of determination of weighted case units for the purpose of calculating the judicial branch budget request and judicial salaries.
Title
Changing the timing of determination of weighted case units for the purpose of calculating the judicial branch budget request and judicial salaries.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-11 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/05/2015; Chapter 0109; Effective 06/05/2015 |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 5/7/2015); Senate Journal 14 |
2015-05-06 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 41, PG. 1779 |
2015-04-29 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 36, PG. 1578 |
2015-04-16 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Apr 29 (Vote 23-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 32, PG. 1483 |
2015-04-08 | House | Executive Session: 4/16/2015 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2015-04-02 | House | Division I Work Session: 4/9/2015 2:15 PM Legislative Office Building 212 |
2015-04-02 | House | Public Hearing: 4/8/2015 1:45 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2015-03-12 | House | Introduced and Referred to Finance; House Journal 26, PG. 1275 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 8 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/12/15; Senate Calendar 12 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Hearing: 3/3/15, Room 103, State House, 1:45 p.m.; Senate Calendar 11 |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 6 |