NH SB261 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-05 - Signed by the Governor on 08/01/2014; Chapter 0318; Effective 09/30/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-05 - Signed by the Governor on 08/01/2014; Chapter 0318; Effective 09/30/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Allowing the commissioner of administrative services to administer the health benefits of certain retirees of the State Employees Association of New Hampshire.
Title
Allowing the commissioner of administrative services to administer the health benefits of certain retirees of the State Employees Association of New Hampshire.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-04 - House - Adopt CofC Report (Y: 213 N: 130 NV: 19 Abs: 24) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-05 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 08/01/2014; Chapter 0318; Effective 09/30/2014 |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-06-04 | House | Enrolled (In recess of 6/4/2014) |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 1943c; Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 15 |
2014-06-04 | House | Conference Committee Report #1943c, Adopted Regular Calendar 213-130 |
2014-05-29 | House | Conference Committee Report #2014-1943c; Senate Amendment, Filed |
2014-05-21 | Senate | C of C Meeting: == RECONVENE === 5/27/2014, 12:00 p.m., Room 103, State House |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Committee of Conference Meeting: === TIME CHANGE === 5/21/2014, 2:30 p.m., Room 103, State House === RECESSED === |
2014-05-14 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Weber, Schuett, Peter Schmidt, Sytek |
2014-05-14 | House | House Accedes to Senate Request for Committee of Conference: Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-05-08 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Odell, Forrester, and D'Allesandro |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Sen. Forrester Moved Nonconcur with House Amendment 1229h, New Title; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 11 |
2014-04-16 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #1229h (NT) Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-04-16 | House | Amendment #2014-1229h (New Title) Amendment Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-04-10 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2014-04-10 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-1229h (NT) (Vote 13-5; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 27 |
2014-04-02 | House | Executive Session: 4/8/2014 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2014-03-25 | House | Public Hearing: 4/1/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2014-03-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0524s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0524s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0524s, New Title, 2/19/14; Senate Calendar 7 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Hearing: 1/21/2014, Room 103, State House, 1:45 p.m.; Senate Calendar 2 |
2013-12-11 | Senate | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Finance |