NH SB275 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-28 - Signed by the Governor on 05/27/2014; Chapter 0074; Effective 07/26/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-28 - Signed by the Governor on 05/27/2014; Chapter 0074; Effective 07/26/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to refusal to certify an absentee ballot application.
Title
Relative to refusal to certify an absentee ballot application.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-28 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 05/27/2014; Chapter 0074; Effective 07/26/2014 |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Enrolled 05/01/2014 |
2014-05-05 | House | Enrolled (In recess of 4/30/14) |
2014-04-23 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-04-16 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 28 |
2014-04-09 | House | Executive Session: 4/15/14 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2014-03-19 | House | Public Hearing: 4/1/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 308 |
2014-03-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to Election Law |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0439, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0439, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0439s, 2/13/14; Senate Calendar 6 |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Hearing: 1/29/14, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 11:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 4 |
2013-12-11 | Senate | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs |