NH SB278 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-16 - Signed by the Governor on 06/11/2014; Chapter 0115; Effective 08/10/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-16 - Signed by the Governor on 06/11/2014; Chapter 0115; Effective 08/10/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the absentee voter website.
Title
Relative to the absentee voter website.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-16 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/11/2014; Chapter 0115; Effective 08/10/2014 |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Enrolled 05/01/2014 |
2014-05-05 | House | Enrolled (In recess of 4/30/14) |
2014-04-23 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-04-16 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 31 |
2014-04-09 | House | Executive Session: 4/15/14 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2014-03-25 | House | Public Hearing: 4/3/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2014-03-20 | House | Introduced and Referred to Election Law |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/6/14; Senate Calendar 8 |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Hearing: 2/19/14, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 7 |
2013-12-11 | Senate | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs |