NH SB279 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 1 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-07 - Senate Sen. Groen Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 6, Pg.164
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing registers of probate as clerks of the probate division of the circuit court.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing registers of probate as clerks of the probate division of the circuit court.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-07 Senate Sen. Groen Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 6, Pg.164
2012-03-07 Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Not Voted On; Senate Journal 6, Pg.164
2012-02-21 Senate Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 3/7/12; Senate Calendar 9
2012-02-01 Senate Hearing: ===RECONVENE=== 2/9/12, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 6
2012-01-13 Senate Hearing: === RECESSED === 1/12/12, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 1:15 p.m.
2012-01-05 Senate Hearing: 1/12/12, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 1:15 p.m.; Senate Calendar 2
2012-01-01 Senate Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 1, Pg.7

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback