NH SB304 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-18 - Pending Motion Committee Amendment #2016-0489s; 02/18/2016; Senate Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-18 - Pending Motion Committee Amendment #2016-0489s; 02/18/2016; Senate Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting corporate advertising and marketing on school property.
Title
Prohibiting corporate advertising and marketing on school property.
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Stiles [R] | Rep. John Balcom [R] | Sen. Thomas Sherman [D] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] |
Rep. Barbara Shaw [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-18 | Senate | Pending Motion Committee Amendment #2016-0489s; 02/18/2016; Senate Journal 6 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Sen. Prescott Moved Laid on Table, Division Vote 12Y-10N, Motion Adopted; Senate Journal 6 |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-0489s, 02/18/2016; Senate Calendar 6 |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Hearing: 01/21/2016, Room 100, State House, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 2 |
2015-12-29 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/06/2016 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 1 |