NH SB307 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-02 - Committee of Conference Report: Not signed off; House Calendar 42A, PG. 2000
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-02 - Committee of Conference Report: Not signed off; House Calendar 42A, PG. 2000
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to review Citizens United amendments to the United States Constitution.
Title
Establishing a committee to review Citizens United amendments to the United States Constitution.
Sponsors
Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Sen. Sylvia Larsen [D] | Rep. Robert Perry [D] | Sen. David Watters [D] |
Rep. Robert Cushing [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-22 - Senate - Non-concur Request Committee of Conference (Y: 12 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - House - OTPA (Y: 183 N: 87 NV: 72 Abs: 45) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Floor Amendment 1189s (Y: 12 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Committee Amendment 0934s (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - House - OTPA (Y: 183 N: 87 NV: 72 Abs: 45) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Floor Amendment 1189s (Y: 12 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Committee Amendment 0934s (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-02 | House | Committee of Conference Report: Not signed off; House Calendar 42A, PG. 2000 |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Committee of Conference Meeting: 5/29/2014, 1:00 p.m., Room 103, State House |
2014-05-28 | House | Conferee Change: Rep. Williams Replaces Rep. Carey |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Conferee Change; Senator Rausch Replaces Senator Carson |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Committee of Conference Meeting: 5/28/2014, 3:30 p.m., Room 100, State House |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Conferee Change; Senator Carson Replaces Senator Prescott |
2014-05-22 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Theberge, Massimilla, Carey, Priestley |
2014-05-22 | House | Rep. Almy moved to accede to request for C of C; Motion Adopted Voice Vote (In recess of 5/15/2014) |
2014-05-22 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Bradley, Prescott, and Fuller Clark; Senate Journal 14 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Sen. Prescott Moved Nonconcur with House Amendment #1600h; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Regular Calendar 12Y-11N; Senate Journal 14 |
2014-05-15 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #1600h Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 183-87 |
2014-05-15 | House | Amendment #2014-1600h Amendment Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-05-06 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2014-05-06 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-1600h (Vote 8-5; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 35 |
2014-04-02 | House | Executive Session: 5/1/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2014-04-02 | House | Public Hearing: 4/24/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2014-04-01 | House | Introduced (In Recess, 3/26/14) and Referred to State-Federal Relations and Veterans Affairs |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0934s, Motion Adopted, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N; OT3rdg |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Sen. Fuller Clark Floor Amendment #2014-1189s, Amendment Failed, Regular Calendar 12Y-12N; Senate Journal 8 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0934s, Amendment Adopted, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N; Senate Journal 8 |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0934s, 3/27/14; Senate Calendar 11 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | ===RESCHEDULED=== Hearing: 3/4/14, Room 100, State House, 1:45 p.m.; Senate Calendar 8 |
2014-02-06 | Senate | ===CANCELLED=== Hearing: 2/19/14, Room 103, State House, 10:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 6 |
2013-12-17 | Senate | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Rules Enrolled Bills and Internal Affairs |