NH SB321 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-18 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 05/18/2010; Effective 07/17/2010; Chapter 0038
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-18 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 05/18/2010; Effective 07/17/2010; Chapter 0038
Summary
Relative to the state coordinating council for community transportation in New Hampshire.
Title
Relative to the state coordinating council for community transportation in New Hampshire.
Sponsors
Sen. Lou D'Allesandro [D] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Sen. Bob Odell [R] | Rep. Donna Schlachman [D] |
Rep. Carla Skinder [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-18 | Senate Signed by the Governor on 05/18/2010; Effective 07/17/2010; Chapter 0038 | |
2010-04-21 | House Enrolled; House Journal 35, PG.1671 | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Enrolled | |
2010-04-14 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 32, PG.1581 | |
2010-03-24 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for April 14 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 29, PG.1457 | |
2010-03-16 | House Executive Session: 3/23/2010 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 | |
2010-03-03 | House Public Hearing: 3/16/2010 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 | |
2010-02-17 | House Introduced and Referred to Transportation; House Journal 18, PG.1017 | |
2010-02-17 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 7, Pg.89 | |
2010-02-17 | Senate Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 7, Pg.86 | |
2010-02-11 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass 2/17/10; Senate Calendar 7 | |
2010-01-13 | Senate Hearing; January 20, 2010, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 12:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 3 | |
2010-01-06 | Senate Introduced 1/6/2010 and Referred to Transportation and Interstate Cooperation; Senate Journal 1, Pg.5 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2789&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |