NH SB321 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-05 - Signed by the Governor on 08/01/2014; Chapter 0320; Effective 08/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-05 - Signed by the Governor on 08/01/2014; Chapter 0320; Effective 08/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to motorist service signs.
Title
Relative to motorist service signs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-05 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 08/01/2014; Chapter 0320; Effective 08/01/2014 |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-06-04 | House | Enrolled (In recess of 6/4/2014) |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 1934c; Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 15 |
2014-06-04 | House | Conference Committee Report #1934c, Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-05-29 | House | Conference Committee Report #2014-1934c; House Amendment, Filed |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Committee of Conference Meeting: 5/27/2014, 10:00 a.m., Room 102, Legislative Office Building |
2014-05-22 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps Cloutier, Ebel, Ratzki, Waterhouse |
2014-05-22 | House | Rep Almy moved to accede to request for C of C; Motion Adopted Voice Vote (In recess of 5/15/14) |
2014-05-22 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Rausch, Bradley, and Gilmour; Senate Journal 14 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Sen. Rausch Moved Nonconcur with House Amendment #1760h; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 14 |
2014-05-14 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #1760h Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-05-14 | House | Amendment #2014-1760h Amendment Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-05-08 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-1760h (Vote 17-1; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 35 |
2014-05-07 | House | Executive Session: 5/7/2014 12:15 PM or at lunch break from session 201 Legislative Office Building |
2014-04-16 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 4/22/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 |
2014-04-09 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 4/16/14 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 201 |
2014-04-02 | House | Public Hearing: 4/9/2014 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 |
2014-04-01 | House | Introduced (In Recess, 3/26/14) and Referred to Public Works and Highways |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 8 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Sen. Gilmour Moved Ought to Pass; Senate Journal 8 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Division Vote. 8Y-16N, Motion Failed; Senate Journal 8 |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 3/27/14; Senate Calendar 11 |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0278s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5 |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0278s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved to Remove SB 321 from the Consent Calendar |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0278s, 2/6/14; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 5 |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Hearing: 1/21/14, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 1:10 p.m.; Senate Calendar 3 |
2013-12-17 | Senate | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Transportation |