NH SB336 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-24 - Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED === Senate Journal 11, Pg.176
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-24 - Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED === Senate Journal 11, Pg.176
Summary
Relative to payroll deductions.
Title
Relative to payroll deductions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-24 | Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED === Senate Journal 11, Pg.176 | |
2010-03-18 | Senate Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 3/24/10; Senate Calendar 12 | |
2010-01-21 | Senate Hearing; January 26, 2010, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 8:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 4 | |
2010-01-06 | Senate Introduced 1/6/2010 and Referred to Commerce, Labor and Consumer Protection Committee; Senate Journal 1, Pg.6 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2902&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |