NH SB349 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Introduced on December 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/16/2022; Senate Journal 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/16/2022; Senate Journal 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the legislature to give preference to deceased military veterans and first responders in the naming of bridges.
Title
Requiring the legislature to give preference to deceased military veterans and first responders in the naming of bridges.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/16/2022; Senate Journal 3 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 02/16/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 7 |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Hearing: 01/25/2022, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:20 pm; Senate Calendar 2 |
2021-12-15 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 1 |