NH SB352 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass 04/25/2024 (Vote 20-0; Regular Calendar)
Hearing: May 1 @ 10:00 am in Legislative Office Building 210-211
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass 04/25/2024 (Vote 20-0; Regular Calendar)
Hearing: May 1 @ 10:00 am in Legislative Office Building 210-211
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing an early detection cancer screening pilot program for active and retired firefighters.
Title
Establishing an early detection cancer screening pilot program for active and retired firefighters.
Sponsors
Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Sen. Regina Birdsell [R] | Sen. Donna Soucy [D] | Sen. Suzanne Prentiss [D] |
Rep. Michael O'Brien [D] | Rep. Timothy Soucy [D] | Rep. Jeffrey Goley [D] | Rep. Tracy Emerick [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-21 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass 04/25/2024 (Vote 20-0; Regular Calendar) |
2024-04-24 | House | Executive Session: 05/01/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2024-04-17 | House | Public Hearing: 04/25/2024 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2024-02-29 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 02/22/2024 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 6 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 02/21/2024; Senate Journal 5 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Special Order to the end of Finance, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 02/21/2024; Senate Journal 5 |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/21/2024, Vote 7-0; Senate Calendar 8 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0173s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/08/2024; Senate Journal 3 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2024-0173s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/08/2024; Senate Journal 3 |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0173s, 02/08/2024, Vote 5-0; Senate Calendar 6 |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Hearing: 01/17/2024, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 3 |
2023-12-11 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 1 |