NH SB357 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-10)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Signed by the Governor on 05/14/2014; Chapter 0012; Effective 05/14/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-10)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Signed by the Governor on 05/14/2014; Chapter 0012; Effective 05/14/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Naming a scenic overlook and the visitor center on the northbound side of I-93 in Hooksett in honor of Raymond S. Burton.
Title
Naming a scenic overlook and the visitor center on the northbound side of I-93 in Hooksett in honor of Raymond S. Burton.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-13 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 05/14/2014; Chapter 0012; Effective 05/14/2014 |
2014-05-01 | House | Enrolled (In recess of 4/30/14) |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled 04/24/2014 |
2014-04-16 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-04-08 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (NT) (Vote 19-0 Regular Calendar); House Calendar 27 |
2014-03-26 | House | Executive Session: 4/1/2014 11:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 |
2014-03-26 | House | Public Hearing: 4/1/2014 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 |
2014-03-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to Public Works and Highways |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0433s, New Title, 0532s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rd |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Sen. Woodburn Floor Amendment #2014-0532s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0433s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Without Objection Rule 3-17 is Suspended to Allow Non-Germane Amendment 0433s, New Title, 2/3 necessary, Motion Adopted |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Chair Ruled Non-Germane Amendment |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0433s, New Title, 2/13/14; Senate Calendar 6 |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Hearing: 2/5/14, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 8:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 5 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs |