NH SB359 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Signed by the Governor on 05/15/2018; Chapter 0051; Effective 07/14/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Signed by the Governor on 05/15/2018; Chapter 0051; Effective 07/14/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to notice to school districts of out-of-home placements.
Title
Relative to notice to school districts of out-of-home placements.
Sponsors
Sen. John Reagan [R] | Sen. Ruth Ward [R] | Sen. Bob Giuda [R] | Sen. David Watters [D] |
Sen. Jay Kahn [D] | Rep. Roderick Ladd [R] | Rep. Michael Moffett [R] | Rep. Glenn Cordelli [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-17 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 05/15/2018; Chapter 0051; Effective 07/14/2018 |
2018-04-19 | House | Enrolled 04/19/2018 House Journal 13 P. 2 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 04/12/2018); Senate Journal 13 |
2018-04-05 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/05/2018 House Journal 11 P. 3 |
2018-03-22 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/05/2018 (Vote 8-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 3 |
2018-03-22 | House | Executive Session: 03/20/2018 Legislative Office Building 206 |
2018-03-14 | House | Public Hearing: 03/20/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 206 |
2018-03-12 | House | Introduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 7 P. 51 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-0487s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/15/2018; Senate Journal 4 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-0487s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/15/2018; Senate Journal 4 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0487s, 02/15/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 7 |
2017-12-14 | Senate | Hearing: 01/23/2018, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 48 |
2017-12-12 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 1 |