NH SB362 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-25 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 38, PG.2157
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-25 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 38, PG.2157
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to benefits related to service of certain part-time judges of probate retiring because of permanent disability.
Title
Relative to benefits related to service of certain part-time judges of probate retiring because of permanent disability.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-25 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 38, PG.2157 | |
2012-04-18 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for April 25 (Vote 17-6; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 33, PG.1924 | |
2012-04-10 | House Executive Session: 4/17/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 | |
2012-02-21 | House ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 3/27/2012 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 | |
2012-02-14 | House ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 3/13/2012 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 | |
2012-02-08 | House Introduced and Referred to Finance; House Journal 15, PG.906 | |
2012-01-25 | Senate Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 3, Pg.85 | |
2012-01-19 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 1/25/12; Senate Calendar 4 | |
2012-01-05 | Senate Hearing: 1/12/12, Room 103, State House, 1:00 p.m; Senate Calendar 2 | |
2012-01-01 | Senate Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 1, Pg.13 |