NH SB375 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study 04/23/2024 (Vote 19-1; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study 04/23/2024 (Vote 19-1; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to biological sex in student athletics.
Title
Relative to biological sex in student athletics.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-05 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-05 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-04-05 - Senate - Committee Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-05 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-04-05 - Senate - Committee Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study 04/23/2024 (Vote 19-1; Consent Calendar) |
2024-04-16 | House | Executive Session: 04/22/2024 12:45 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2024-04-16 | House | Public Hearing: 04/22/2024 10:45 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2024-04-10 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 03/28/2024 and referred to Education House Journal 11 |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1335s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 04/05/2024; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Sen. Perkins Kwoka Floor Amendment # 2024-1437s, Regular Calendar 10Y-14N, Amendment Failed; 04/05/2024; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2024-1335s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Amendment Adopted; 04/05/2024; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1335s, 04/05/2024, Vote 3-2; Senate Calendar 13 |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Hearing: 01/30/2024, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 5 |
2023-12-12 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 1 |