NH SB385 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass 04/16/2024 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass 04/16/2024 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the cost of care fund.
Title
Relative to the cost of care fund.
Sponsors
Sen. Howard Pearl [R] | Sen. William Gannon [R] | Sen. David Watters [D] | Sen. Kevin Avard [R] |
Sen. James Gray [R] | Sen. Daniel Innis [R] | Sen. Keith Murphy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass 04/16/2024 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar) |
2024-04-18 | House | Executive Session: 04/16/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2024-04-05 | House | Public Hearing: 04/16/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2024-04-02 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 03/28/2024 and referred to Environment and Agriculture House Journal 10 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/21/2024; Senate Journal 7 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/21/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 11 |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Hearing: 03/12/2024, Room 103, State House, 09:20 am; Senate Calendar 10 |
2023-12-12 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 1 |