NH SB388 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-27 - Signed by the Governor on 06/16/14; Chapter 0148; Effective 06/16/14
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-27 - Signed by the Governor on 06/16/14; Chapter 0148; Effective 06/16/14
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study the current status of land conservation in New Hampshire and the state's role in encouraging voluntary protection of land in the future.
Title
Establishing a committee to study the current status of land conservation in New Hampshire and the state's role in encouraging voluntary protection of land in the future.
Sponsors
Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Rep. Mary Wallner [D] | Sen. Bob Odell [R] |
Sen. Jeff Woodburn [D] | Sen. Jeanie Forrester [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-14 - House - OTP (Y: 216 N: 60 NV: 33 Abs: 78) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-27 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/16/14; Chapter 0148; Effective 06/16/14 |
2014-05-22 | House | Enrolled (In recess of 5/15/2014) |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-05-14 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 216-60 |
2014-05-08 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 9-2; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 35 |
2014-04-23 | House | Executive Session: 5/1/2014 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 |
2014-04-03 | House | Public Hearing: 4/16/2014 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 305 |
2014-04-03 | House | ===CANCELLED=== Public Hearing: 4/15/2014 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 |
2014-04-01 | House | Public Hearing: 4/15/2014 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 |
2014-04-01 | House | Introduced (In Recess, 3/26/14) and Referred to Resources, Recreation and Development |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 8 |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/27/14; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 11 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Hearing: 3/12/14, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 9:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 9 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources |