NH SB392 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-25 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 38, PG.2143
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-25 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 38, PG.2143
Summary
Relative to road salt applicators.
Title
Relative to road salt applicators.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Azarian [R] | Rep. David Bettencourt [R] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Rep. Gene Chandler [R] |
Rep. Robert Elliott [R] | Sen. Charles Morse [R] | Sen. James Rausch [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-25 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 38, PG.2143 | |
2012-04-17 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for April 25 (Vote 10-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 33, PG.1917 | |
2012-04-03 | House Executive Session: 4/17/2012 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2012-04-03 | House Public Hearing: 4/12/2012 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2012-03-21 | House Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 28, PG.1719 | |
2012-03-21 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 1211s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 7, Pg.257 | |
2012-03-21 | Senate Committee Amendment 1211s; Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 7, Pg.227 | |
2012-03-15 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2012-1211s, 3/21/12; Senate Calendar 11 | |
2012-02-22 | Senate Hearing: 3/8/12, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 9 | |
2012-02-08 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 5, Pg.120 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=3051&sy=2012&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2012&q=1 |