NH SB4 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-26 - Sen. Birdsell moved to Rerefer to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-26 - Sen. Birdsell moved to Rerefer to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to domicile for voting purposes.
Title
Relative to domicile for voting purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Sen. Regina Birdsell [R] | Rep. Carol McGuire [R] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] |
Rep. Gene Chandler [R] | Rep. Adam Schroadter [R] | Sen. Nancy Stiles [R] | Rep. Kathleen Hoelzel [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | Senate | Sen. Birdsell moved to Rerefer to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 10 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/26/15; Senate Calendar 14 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Hearing: 3/11/15, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 12 |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 4 |