NH SB42 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-14 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/14/2011; Effective 08/13/2011; Chapter 0179
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-14 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/14/2011; Effective 08/13/2011; Chapter 0179
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the declaration of consideration for purposes of the real estate transfer tax.
Title
Relative to the declaration of consideration for purposes of the real estate transfer tax.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Odell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-14 | Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/14/2011; Effective 08/13/2011; Chapter 0179 | |
2011-06-08 | Senate Enrolled | |
2011-06-08 | House Enrolled; House Journal 51, PG.1724 | |
2011-05-25 | Senate Sen. Odell Concurs with House Amendment #1350h, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 18, Pg.390 | |
2011-04-27 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #1350h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 40, PG.1355 | |
2011-04-27 | House Amendment #1350h Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 40, PG.1355 | |
2011-04-21 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #2011-1350h; House Calendar 33, PG.1081 | |
2011-04-21 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #1350h for April 27 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 33, PG.1068 | |
2011-04-13 | House Executive Session: 4/21/2011 12:30 PM Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2011-03-30 | House ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 4/5/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2011-03-10 | House Public Hearing: 3/22/2011 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2011-02-16 | House Introduced and Referred to Ways and Means; House Journal 19, Pg. 438 | |
2011-02-16 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution, Senate Journal 6, Pg.61 | |
2011-02-16 | Senate Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg, Senate Journal 6, Pg.60 | |
2011-02-09 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 2/16/2011; Senate Calendar 11 | |
2011-02-03 | Senate Hearing: 2/8/11, Room 100 State House, 1:15 p.m.; Senate Calendar 10 | |
2011-01-19 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Ways & Means, Senate Journal 3, Pg.33 |