NH SB421 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on December 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/15/2024; Senate Journal 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/15/2024; Senate Journal 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to felony criminal threatening.
Title
Relative to felony criminal threatening.
Sponsors
Sen. Howard Pearl [R] | Sen. David Watters [D] | Sen. William Gannon [R] | Sen. Ruth Ward [R] |
Sen. Timothy Lang [R] | Sen. Regina Birdsell [R] | Sen. Daniel Innis [R] | Sen. Carrie Gendreau [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/15/2024; Senate Journal 4 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 02/15/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 7 |
2023-12-20 | Senate | Hearing: 01/09/2024, Room 100, State House, 01:20 pm; Senate Calendar 49 |
2023-12-12 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 1 |