NH SB429 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Public Hearing: 03/19/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 203
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Public Hearing: 03/19/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 203
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the color of executive council official cover plates.
Title
Relative to the color of executive council official cover plates.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | House | Public Hearing: 03/19/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 203 |
2024-02-29 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 02/22/2024 and referred to Transportation House Journal 6 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/08/2024; Senate Journal 3 |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/08/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 6 |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Hearing: 01/16/2024, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 3 |
2023-12-12 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 1 |