NH SB446 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Vetoed by Governor 05/03/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Vetoed by Governor 05/03/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to requirements of the state building code.
Title
Relative to requirements of the state building code.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-04 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 05/03/2016 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 04/21/2016); Senate Journal 15 |
2016-04-26 | House | Enrolled 04/20/2016 House Journal 36 P. 51 |
2016-04-06 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/06/2016 House Journal 31 P. 18 |
2016-03-31 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/06/2016 (Vote 9-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 21 P. 13 |
2016-03-23 | House | Executive Session: 03/29/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2016-03-15 | House | Public Hearing: 03/24/2016 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2016-03-15 | House | Introduced 03/10/2016 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 25 P. 118 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/10/2016; Senate Journal 8 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/10/2016; Senate Calendar 9 |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Hearing: 02/03/2016, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 4 |
2015-12-29 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/06/2016 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 1 |