NH SB447 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Executive Session: 04/23/2024 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 301-303
Pending: House Municipal and County Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Executive Session: 04/23/2024 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 301-303
Pending: House Municipal and County Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study the inclusion of transportation expenses in default budgets.
Title
Establishing a committee to study the inclusion of transportation expenses in default budgets.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | House | Executive Session: 04/23/2024 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2024-04-10 | House | Public Hearing: 04/17/2024 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2024-02-29 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 02/22/2024 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 6 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0358s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/08/2024; Senate Journal 3 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2024-0358s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/08/2024; Senate Journal 3 |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0358s, 02/08/2024, Vote 4-0; Senate Calendar 6 |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Hearing: 01/23/2024, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 4 |
2023-12-12 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 1 |