NH SB48 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-16 - Senate Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote, Senate Journal 5, Pg.56
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-16 - Senate Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote, Senate Journal 5, Pg.56
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to filing of rates for certain telephone services.
Title
Relative to filing of rates for certain telephone services.
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Lambert [R] | Sen. Jim Luther [R] | Sen. Bob Odell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-16 | Senate Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote, Senate Journal 5, Pg.56 | |
2011-02-08 | Senate Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 2/16/2011; Senate Calendar 11 | |
2011-01-21 | Senate Hearing: === TIME CHANGE === 2/03/11, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:45 a.m.; Senate Calendar 9 | |
2011-01-19 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources, Senate Journal 3, Pg.33 |