NH SB480 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1568h (NT) 04/23/2024 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 17 P. 10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1568h (NT) 04/23/2024 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 17 P. 10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the administration of professional licensure and certification and the regulation of real estate practice.
Title
Relative to the administration of professional licensure and certification and the regulation of real estate practice.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1568h (NT) 04/23/2024 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 17 P. 10 |
2024-04-17 | House | Executive Session: 04/23/2024 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2024-04-10 | House | Public Hearing: 04/17/2024 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2024-04-02 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 03/28/2024 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 10 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/21/2024; Senate Journal 7 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/21/2024, Vote 7-0; Senate Calendar 11 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/21/2024; Senate Journal 5 |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/21/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 8 |
2023-12-18 | Senate | Hearing: 01/03/2024, Room 103, State House, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 49 |
2023-12-13 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 1 |