NH SB498 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2024 House Journal 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2024 House Journal 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the department of health and human services, division for children, youth and families.
Title
Relative to the department of health and human services, division for children, youth and families.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-02 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2024 House Journal 12 |
2024-04-11 | House | Special Order Without Objection House Journal 11 |
2024-04-11 | House | Removed from Consent (Reps. Granger, McGough, T. Mannion, T. Lekas, McCarter, Peternel, Popovici-Muller, A. Lekas, Love, Layon) 04/11/2024 House Journal 11 |
2024-04-03 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass 04/02/2024 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 17 P. 15 |
2024-04-03 | House | Executive Session: 04/02/2024 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2024-03-20 | House | Public Hearing: 04/02/2024 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2024-03-02 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 02/22/2024 and referred to Children and Family Law |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/08/2024; Senate Journal 3 |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/08/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 6 |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Hearing: 01/31/2024, Room 100, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 5 |
2023-12-13 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 1 |