NH SB500 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/07/2024; Senate Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/07/2024; Senate Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a primary care provider loan repayment program, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Establishing a primary care provider loan repayment program, and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/07/2024; Senate Journal 6 |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 03/07/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 9 |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Hearing: 01/17/2024, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 3 |
2023-12-13 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 1 |