NH SB523 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on December 14 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Shall House Consider: Motion Failed DV 187-193 lacking necessary two-thirds vote 04/11/2024 House Journal 11
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 14 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Shall House Consider: Motion Failed DV 187-193 lacking necessary two-thirds vote 04/11/2024 House Journal 11
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the regulation of public school materials.
Title
Relative to the regulation of public school materials.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Avard [R] | Sen. Carrie Gendreau [R] | Rep. Leah Cushman [R] | Rep. Jim Kofalt [R] |
Rep. Jeanine Notter [R] | Rep. Diane Pauer [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-05 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | House | Shall House Consider: Motion Failed DV 187-193 lacking necessary two-thirds vote 04/11/2024 House Journal 11 |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1337s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 04/05/2024; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2024-1337s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/05/2024; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1337s, 04/05/2024, Vote 3-2; Senate Calendar 13 |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Hearing: 01/30/2024, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 5 |
2023-12-14 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 1 |