NH SB534 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 04/30/2024 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 301-303
Pending: House Election Law Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 10:30 am in Legislative Office Building 301-303
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 04/30/2024 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 301-303
Pending: House Election Law Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 10:30 am in Legislative Office Building 301-303
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to campaign finance.
Title
Relative to campaign finance.
Sponsors
Sen. James Gray [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 04/30/2024 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2024-04-17 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 04/24/2024 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2024-04-17 | House | Public Hearing: 04/24/2024 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2024-04-10 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 03/28/2024 and referred to Election Law House Journal 11 |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1217s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/05/2024; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2024-1217s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/05/2024; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1217s, 04/05/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 13 |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Hearing: 01/30/2024, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 5 |
2023-12-14 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 1 |