NH SB540 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the department of energy to investigate behind the meter and utility scale energy storage.
Title
Requiring the department of energy to investigate behind the meter and utility scale energy storage.
Sponsors
Sen. Timothy Lang [R] | Sen. David Watters [D] | Sen. Howard Pearl [R] | Sen. Keith Murphy [R] |
Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Sen. Rebecca Perkins Kwoka [D] | Rep. Michael Moffett [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2024-04-16 | House | Majority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study 04/15/2024 (Vote 11-8; Regular Calendar) |
2024-04-05 | House | Executive Session: 04/15/2024 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2024-03-20 | House | Public Hearing: 03/25/2024 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2024-03-02 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 02/22/2024 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0556s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/15/2024; Senate Journal 4 |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2024-0556s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/15/2024; Senate Journal 4 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0556s, 02/15/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 7 |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Hearing: 01/23/2024, Room 103, State House, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 4 |
2023-12-14 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 1 |