NH SB56 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-14 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/14/2011; Effective 08/13/2011; Chapter 0180
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-14 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/14/2011; Effective 08/13/2011; Chapter 0180
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing the department of revenue administration to accept credit card and debit card payments of taxes.
Title
Authorizing the department of revenue administration to accept credit card and debit card payments of taxes.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Odell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-14 | Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/14/2011; Effective 08/13/2011; Chapter 0180 | |
2011-06-08 | Senate Enrolled | |
2011-06-08 | House Enrolled; House Journal 51, PG.1724 | |
2011-05-25 | Senate Sen. Odell Concurs with House Amendment #1837h, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 18, Pg.390 | |
2011-05-18 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #1837h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 44, PG.1546-1547 | |
2011-05-18 | House Amendment #1837h Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 44, PG.1546-1547 | |
2011-05-11 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #2011-1837h; House Calendar 39, PG.1341 | |
2011-05-11 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #1837h for May 18 (Vote 26-0; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 39, PG.1324 | |
2011-05-05 | House ==Reconvene== Executive Session: 5/10/2011 9:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 | |
2011-04-28 | House Executive Session: 5/5/2011 Legislative Office Building 210-211 3:00 PM or immediately following work session ==Recessed== | |
2011-04-28 | House Full Committee Work Session: 5/5/2011 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211 | |
2011-04-28 | House Public Hearing: 5/5/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 | |
2011-04-27 | House Referred to Finance; House Journal 40, PG.1355 | |
2011-04-27 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 40, PG.1355 | |
2011-04-21 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for April 27 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 33, PG.1068 | |
2011-04-13 | House Executive Session: 4/21/2011 12:30 PM Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2011-03-30 | House Public Hearing: 4/5/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2011-03-28 | House Introduced and Referred to Ways and Means; House Journal 30, PG.1036 | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 10, Pg.187 | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 10, Pg.174 | |
2011-03-17 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/23/11; Senate Calendar 16 | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 0688s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-3; Senate Journal 9, Pg.140 | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Committee Amendment 0688s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 9, Pg.140 | |
2011-03-08 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2011-0688s, New Title, Session Date: 3/16/11; Senate Calendar 15 | |
2011-02-24 | Senate Hearing: 3/7/11, Room 100, State House, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 13 | |
2011-02-03 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Ways & Means, Senate Journal 5, Pg.44 |