NH SB588 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Executive Session: 04/24/2024 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 307
Pending: House Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Executive Session: 04/24/2024 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 307
Pending: House Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to employer notice of veterans' benefits and services.
Title
Relative to employer notice of veterans' benefits and services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Executive Session: 04/24/2024 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 307 |
2024-04-15 | House | Public Hearing: 04/24/2024 09:45 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2024-04-10 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 03/28/2024 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services House Journal 11 |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/05/2024; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/05/2024, Vote 4-0; Senate Calendar 13 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Hearing: 03/19/2024, Room 100, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 11 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced 01/18/2024 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 3 |