NH SB594 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/05/2024; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/05/2024; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Defining state approved processing facility and regulating on farm slaughter of amenable animals.
Title
Defining state approved processing facility and regulating on farm slaughter of amenable animals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/05/2024; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 04/05/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 13 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Hearing: 02/20/2024, Room 103, State House, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 8 |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Introduced 01/18/2024 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 3 |