NH SB638 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/13/2020; Senate Journal 4
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing the New Hampshire housing and conservation planning program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing the New Hampshire housing and conservation planning program.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13SenateRefer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/13/2020; Senate Journal 4
2020-02-04SenateCommittee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 02/13/2020; Senate Calendar 6
2020-01-30SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2020-0306s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 01/30/2020; Senate Journal 2
2020-01-30SenateSen. Fuller Clark Floor Amendment # 2020-0306s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/30/2020; Senate Journal 2
2020-01-30SenateSen. Fuller Clark Moved to Remove SB 638-FN from the Consent Calendar; 01/30/2020; Senate Journal 2
2020-01-23SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 01/30/2020; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 4
2020-01-15SenateHearing: 01/22/2020, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 3
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 2

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback