NH SB67 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-28 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/28/2011; Effective 06/28/2011; Chapter 0218
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-28 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/28/2011; Effective 06/28/2011; Chapter 0218
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study the implementation of an education tax credit plan in New Hampshire.
Title
Establishing a committee to study the implementation of an education tax credit plan in New Hampshire.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom DeBlois [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-28 | Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/28/2011; Effective 06/28/2011; Chapter 0218 | |
2011-06-08 | House Enrolled; House Journal 51, PG.1727 | |
2011-06-08 | Senate Enrolled | |
2011-06-08 | Senate Sen. Stiles Concurs with House Amendment #1962h, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 20, Pg.550 | |
2011-05-25 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #1962h(NT): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 273-100; House Journal 46, PG.1591-1594 | |
2011-05-25 | House Amendment #1962h(NT) Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 46, PG.1591-1592 | |
2011-05-18 | House Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; House Calendar 41, PG.1394 | |
2011-05-18 | House Proposed Majority Committee Amendment #2011-1962h (New Title); House Calendar 41, PG.1407-1408 | |
2011-05-18 | House Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #1962h(NT) for May 25 (Vote 12-4; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 41, PG.1394 | |
2011-04-27 | House Executive Session: 5/17/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 205-207 | |
2011-04-05 | House Public Hearing: 4/21/2011 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 207 | |
2011-02-16 | House Introduced and Referred to Education; House Journal 19, Pg.439 | |
2011-02-16 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution, Senate Journal 6, Pg.61 | |
2011-02-16 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 0246s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg, Senate Journal 6, Pg.54 | |
2011-02-16 | Senate Committee Amendment 0246s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote, Senate Journal 6, Pg.54 | |
2011-02-09 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2011-0246s, 2/16/2011; Senate Calendar 11 | |
2011-01-27 | Senate Hearing: 2/8/2011, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 2:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 9 | |
2011-01-19 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Education, Senate Journal 3, Pg.34 |