NH SB7 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB7
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 38
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 38
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to eligibility for food stamps and establishing the Granite Workforce pilot program.
Title
Relative to eligibility for food stamps and establishing the Granite Workforce pilot program.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Avard [R] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Sen. Charles Morse [R] | Sen. Regina Birdsell [R] |
Sen. Bob Giuda [R] | Sen. John Reagan [R] | Rep. Frank Kotowski [R] | Rep. Donald LeBrun [R] |
Rep. Kimberly Rice [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 38 |
2017-11-01 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) |
2017-10-11 | House | Executive Session: 10/26/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2017-09-29 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Regular Calendar 10Y-13N, Motion Failed; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12 |
2017-09-05 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/14/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2017-08-15 | House | Retained Bill Full Committee Work Session: 08/31/2017 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2017-04-25 | House | Retained in Committee |
2017-04-12 | House | Executive Session: 04/18/2017 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2017-04-04 | House | Public Hearing: 04/12/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2017-04-04 | House | Introduced 03/23/2017 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 11 P. 27 |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Without Objection, Rule 3-17 is Suspended to Allow Non-Germane Amendment # 2017-1189s; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12 |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2017-1189s; Motion Adopted, OT3rdg; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12 |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Sections 3 through 11, Regular Calendar 12Y-11N; Adopted; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12 |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Sections 1, 2 and 11, Regular Calendar 13Y-10N; Adopted; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12 |
2017-03-31 | Senate | The Chair ruled the Question Divisible; 03/30/2017 Senate Journal 12 |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Sen. Feltes Moved to divide the Question on SB 7-FN-L: Sections 1, 2 and 11, and Sections 3 through 11; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12 |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment # 2017-1189s, Regular Calendar 12Y-11N, Amendment Adopted; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved to Suspend Senate Rule 3-17; 2/3 Necessary, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Sen. Feltes Objected to the Suspension of Senate Rule 3-17; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Chair Ruled Sections of Amendment # 2017-1189s Non-Germane, 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Offered Floor Amendment # 2017-1189s; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Sen. Avard Moved Ought to Pass; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/30/2017; Senate Calendar 16 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Special Order SB 7-FN-L to 03/30/2017, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/29/2017 Senate Journal 11 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Special Order SB 7-FN-L to the Next Session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/23/2017; Senate Journal 10 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/23/2017; Senate Calendar 15 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Sen. Birdsell moved to call the question, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/16/2017 Senate Journal 9 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Hearing: 03/21/2017, Room 103, State House, 01:00 pm, on proposed amendment # 2017-0929s; Senate Calendar 15 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Offered Floor Amendment # 2017-0898s; 03/16/2017; Senate Journal 9 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Sen. Woodburn Moved Laid on Table, Regular Calendar 9Y-14N, Motion Failed; 03/16/2017; Senate Journal 9 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2017-0898s, Regular Calendar 14Y-9N, Motion Adopted; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/16/2017; Senate Journal 9 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment # 2017-0898s, Regular Calendar 14Y-9N, Amendment Adopted; 03/16/2017; Senate Journal 9 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2017-0790s, Division Vote 0Y-16N, Amendment Failed; 03/16/2017; Senate Journal 9 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2017-0790s, 03/16/2017; Senate Calendar 14 |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Hearing: 02/21/2017, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 11 |
2017-02-08 | Senate | ==CANCELLED== Hearing: 02/13/2017, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 10 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 5 |
Same As/Similar To
SB7 (Carry Over) 2017-11-01 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar)