NH SB74 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-25 - Senate Sen. White Moved Laid On Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 3, Pg.80
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-25 - Senate Sen. White Moved Laid On Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 3, Pg.80
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the life settlements act.
Title
Relative to the life settlements act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-25 | Senate Sen. White Moved Laid On Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 3, Pg.80 | |
2012-01-25 | Senate Inexpedient to Legislate Not Voted On | |
2012-01-18 | Senate Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 1/25/12 | |
2012-01-18 | Senate Special Order to 1/25/12, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; Senate Journal 2, Pg.21 | |
2012-01-11 | Senate Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 1/18/12; Senate Calendar 3 | |
2011-03-09 | Senate Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 8, Pg.84 | |
2011-02-25 | Senate Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 3/9/11; Senate Calendar 14 | |
2011-02-10 | Senate Hearing: 2/22/11, Room 100, State House, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 11 | |
2011-02-03 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Commerce, Senate Journal 5, Pg.44 |