NH SB74 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-15 - Conference Committee Report: Not Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-15 - Conference Committee Report: Not Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to economic revitalization zone tax credits.
Title
Relative to economic revitalization zone tax credits.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Rep. Patricia Lovejoy [D] | Sen. Harold French [R] | Rep. Norman Major [R] |
Sen. Daniel Innis [R] | Sen. Lou D'Allesandro [D] | Rep. Patrick Abrami [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-09 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | House | Conference Committee Report: Not Filed |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Committee of Conference Meeting: 06/14/2017, 02:00 pm, Room 103, Legislative Office Building |
2017-06-08 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Major, Abrami, Azarian, Almy 06/08/2017 House Journal 18 P. 6 |
2017-06-08 | House | House Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Rep. Packard): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/08/2017 House Journal 18 P. 6 |
2017-06-08 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Sanborn, Giuda, Feltes; 06/08/2017; Senate Journal 19 |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Sen. Sanborn Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/08/2017; Senate Journal 19 |
2017-06-01 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1808h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/01/2017 House Journal 17 P. 143 |
2017-06-01 | House | Amendment #2017-1808h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/01/2017 House Journal 17 P. 142 |
2017-05-23 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2017-05-23 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-1808h for 06/01/2017 (Vote 16-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 26 P. 19 |
2017-05-10 | House | Executive Session: 05/17/2017 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-05-03 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 05/09/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-04-04 | House | Public Hearing: 04/13/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-04-04 | House | Introduced 03/23/2017 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 11 P. 27 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/30/2017; Senate Calendar 16 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Special Order SB 74-FN to 03/30/2017, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/29/2017 Senate Journal 11 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Special Order SB 74-FN to the Next Session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/23/2017; Senate Journal 10 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/23/2017; Senate Calendar 15 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2017-0572s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/09/2017; Senate Journal 8 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Committee Amendment #2017-0572s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/09/2017; Senate Journal 8 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0572s, 03/09/2017; Senate Calendar 12 |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Hearing: 01/25/2017, Room 100, State House, 09:20 am; Senate Calendar 7 |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Introduced 01/05/2017 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 4 |