NH SB84 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB84
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-30 - Sen. Giuda Moved to Rerefer, Regular Calendar 14Y-9N, Motion Adopted; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-30 - Sen. Giuda Moved to Rerefer, Regular Calendar 14Y-9N, Motion Adopted; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to payment of workers' compensation benefits by direct deposit.
Title
Relative to payment of workers' compensation benefits by direct deposit.
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Soucy [D] | Rep. Linda DiSilvestro [D] | Sen. Bette Lasky [D] | Rep. Jeffrey Goley [D] |
Rep. Mark Proulx [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Rerefer (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | Senate | Sen. Giuda Moved to Rerefer, Regular Calendar 14Y-9N, Motion Adopted; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/30/2017; Senate Calendar 16 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Hearing: 03/21/2017, Room 100, State House, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 15 |
2017-02-15 | Senate | ==CANCELLED== Hearing: 03/14/2017, Room 100, State House, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 11 |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 5 |
Same As/Similar To
SB84 (Carry Over) 2017-03-30 - Sen. Giuda Moved to Rerefer, Regular Calendar 14Y-9N, Motion Adopted; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12