NH SB97 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-26 - Signed by the Governor on 07/23/2021; Chapter 0149; Effective 09/21/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-26 - Signed by the Governor on 07/23/2021; Chapter 0149; Effective 09/21/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to in-network retail pharmacies.
Title
Relative to in-network retail pharmacies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-18 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Committee Amendment 0326s (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Committee Amendment 0326s (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Committee Amendment 0326s (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Committee Amendment 0326s (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-26 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/23/2021; Chapter 0149; Effective 09/21/2021 |
2021-07-12 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/24/2021 |
2021-07-12 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/24/2021); Senate Journal 20 |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/10/2021; Senate Journal 19 |
2021-06-03 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-1606h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/03/2021 House Journal 8 P. 4 |
2021-06-03 | House | Amendment # 2021-1606h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/03/2021 House Journal 8 P. 4 |
2021-05-25 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-1606h (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 26 P. 5 |
2021-05-18 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 05/25/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/94122935505 |
2021-05-05 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 05/13/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/93883325643 |
2021-03-17 | House | Public Hearing: 03/24/2021 11:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/97709851457 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-03-10 | House | Vacated and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs (Rep. Steven Smith): Motion Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of) 02/25/2021 House Journal 4 P. 49 |
2021-03-10 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 02/25/2021 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 4 P. 48 |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-0326s, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 02/18/2021; Senate Journal 5 |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2021-0326s, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Amendment Adopted; 02/18/2021; Senate Journal 5 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0326s, 02/18/2021; Senate Calendar 11 |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 02/03/2021, 09:15 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 9 |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Introduced 01/06/2021 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 3 |